U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00368-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Salas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order Withdrawing Warrant]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • October 19, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 06, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 09, 2022: [Trial Order]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Petition and Order]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 12, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 01, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.