U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Webster
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 10, 2023: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 04, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 08, 2022: [Detention]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • June 06, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 06, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 03, 2022: [Detention]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 02, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.