U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kibodeeaux
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 04, 2022: [Protective Order]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 30, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 30, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • June 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 12, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 02, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.