U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00195-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lawler
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 08, 2022: [Detention]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 02, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • July 27, 2022: [Review of Detention]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 07, 2022: [Detention]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 03, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • June 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.