U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Teerlink
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 21, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 27, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 06, 2022: [Extension of Time]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 05, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 08, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 08, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 08, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 03, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.