U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00137-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Murdock
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Petition and Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [Petition and Order]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 12, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Detention]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 20, 2022: [Petition and Order]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order]
  • August 08, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 30, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 30, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • June 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.