U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00183-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Avalos
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 06, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 06, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 06, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 06, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.