U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Villa-Helo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • July 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 08, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 06, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.