U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00194-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Helmick
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 03, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 27, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 10, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 10, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 10, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 09, 2022: [Detention]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 08, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.