U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00160-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Eziyi et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Self Surrender]
  • October 03, 2024: [Extension of Time to Self Surrender]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 21, 2022: [Joinder]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 30, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Associate/Consolidate Cases]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 15, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [Discovery]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • July 07, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • July 07, 2022: [Discovery]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 07, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.