U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ray
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 12, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 09, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 09, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 09, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 08, 2022: [Detention]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 08, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.