U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00213-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramirez-Aguilar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Opt Out of In-Person Hearing]
  • August 16, 2022: [Opt Out of In-Person Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.