U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00108-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 15, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 09, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 09, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 09, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 09, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • June 08, 2022: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.