U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00174-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rice
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 08, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 08, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 14, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 14, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 14, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 13, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • June 09, 2022: [Detention]
  • June 09, 2022: [Strike]
  • June 09, 2022: [Reassign Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.