U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00209-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gibb
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 12, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 13, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 12, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 09, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 09, 2022: [Brady Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.