U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00175-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thompson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 12, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 06, 2022: [Protective Order]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 20, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 26, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 22, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 22, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 22, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 15, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • June 10, 2022: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.