U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00187-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thaodara et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 19, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • January 17, 2023: [Disclosure]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • January 04, 2023: [Trial Order]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 17, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
  • July 08, 2022: [Review of Detention]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 10, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.