U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00184-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aiono
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 26, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 10, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 10, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 10, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 10, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • June 09, 2022: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.