U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Demetri Robin Murphy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 28, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 05, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • June 14, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 14, 2022: [Unseal Document]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.