U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00205-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Allen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 03, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 14, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 14, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 14, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 14, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • June 14, 2022: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.