U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Joshua Anthony Salas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • August 24, 2022: [Strike]
July, 2022
  • July 17, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • June 14, 2022: [Unseal Document]
  • June 14, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.