U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Briseno
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 06, 2022: [Suppress]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 29, 2022: [Petition and Order]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 23, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 23, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 23, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Detention]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.