U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00072-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Rojas et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 03, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 28, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 12, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • June 17, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Required]
  • June 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 17, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.