U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 26, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 29, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 23, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order]
  • June 22, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 15, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 15, 2022: [Brady Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.