U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00216-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Montes-Duran et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 11, 2023: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 04, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 26, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • July 18, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • July 08, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
  • June 16, 2022: [Review of Detention]
  • June 16, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 16, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 16, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.