U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00172-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ferry
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Amended Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • October 12, 2022: [Review of Detention]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 16, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 16, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 16, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 16, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.