U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00215-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Diaz Cruz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 11, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 16, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 16, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.