U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00204-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Frettoloso
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 29, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 24, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 24, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 23, 2022: [Detention]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.