U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arteaga
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 25, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 24, 2022: [Detention]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 21, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 21, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 21, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.