U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00173-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mitchell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 11, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 19, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order Withdrawing Warrant]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 19, 2022: [Discovery]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 19, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • July 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.