U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McCook
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 14, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 17, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 29, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • June 23, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 22, 2022: [Detention]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 22, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.