U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00206-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [Exclude]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reassign Case]
  • September 07, 2022: [Reassign Case]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 23, 2022: [Detention]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 23, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 23, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 23, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 23, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.