U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00192-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arista-Perez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 19, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 19, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Referring Motion]
  • January 17, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 17, 2023: [Withdraw as Counsel]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 20, 2022: [Discovery]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 24, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 24, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 24, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.