U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00227-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Corry
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Strike]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 06, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 25, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Detention]
  • June 29, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • June 29, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 27, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.