U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fonseca
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • July 17, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • June 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 24, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.