U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00127-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Swanson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 27, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 27, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 27, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • June 27, 2022: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.