U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 03, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 28, 2022: [Detention]
  • June 28, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 28, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 28, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.