U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00196-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aparicio Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 05, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 13, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [Discovery]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 06, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 05, 2022: [Detention]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 30, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.