U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00143-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Binkerd
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 14, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • September 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 01, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.