U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00236-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilkins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 11, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • June 29, 2022: [Detention]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.