U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00231-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Castro-Barahona
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Fast Track Deadlines]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Discovery]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • July 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Fast Track Deadlines St George]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 01, 2022: [Brady Order]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.