U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00235-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harnden
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 06, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • November 18, 2022: [Review of Detention]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 02, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 07, 2022: [Discovery]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 07, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • July 03, 2022: [Detention]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.