U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00240-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harvey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • July 20, 2022: [Discovery]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 20, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Detention]
  • July 01, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 29, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.