U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00241-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nikols
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 07, 2022: [Discovery]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 07, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • July 06, 2022: [Detention]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 01, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.