U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00232-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lexes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 05, 2022: [Order for Exam]
  • September 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • June 30, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • June 30, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 30, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.