U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 20, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 20, 2023: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 20, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • July 11, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 30, 2022: [Detention]
  • June 30, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.