U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00220-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Steinberg
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 14, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • August 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 04, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.