U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00237-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McCook
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order for Exam]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order for Exam]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 04, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • July 12, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • July 07, 2022: [Discovery]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 07, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • July 06, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • July 06, 2022: [Detention]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.