U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00152-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thompson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
July, 2022
  • July 17, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 06, 2022: [Detention]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 06, 2022: [Discovery]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 06, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • July 06, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.