U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00250-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez-Romero
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 19, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • August 17, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 16, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 08, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [Discovery]
  • July 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 07, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 06, 2022: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.